Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Richard Smith

Deceased

Bishop of Ogdensburg, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1905BornAttica
21 Dec 192924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
30 Jun 195246.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
30 Jun 195246.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Marida
24 Sep 195247.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marida
12 Feb 196357.4AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
9 Oct 196358.1DiedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Richard Smith:
Bishop Leo Richard Smith (born , died ) Bishop of Ogdensburg

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013