Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Martin Fox

Deceased

Bishop of Wilcannia-Forbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1893BornBroken Hill
2 Jun 191724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wilcannia, Australia
9 Jun 193138.1AppointedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
20 Sep 193138.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
10 Jul 196774.2DiedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia

MicroData Summary for Thomas Martin Fox:
Bishop Thomas Martin Fox (born , died ) Bishop of Wilcannia-Forbes

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013