Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Sica

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

Titular Archbishop of Damascus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1860BornGiffoni Valle Piana
1883¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 191554.7AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
23 May 191555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
20 Dec 191757.7ResignedBishop of Foligno, Italy
20 Dec 191757.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
21 Nov 192161.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
2 Dec 193979.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Sica:
Archbishop Carlo Sica (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013