Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Maria de Sanctis

Deceased

Bishop of Todi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1883BornRoma
22 Jul 190926.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 192845.1AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
22 Jul 192845.1Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
18 Nov 192845.4InstalledBishop of Segni, Italy
10 Aug 193350.2AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
8 Nov 195976.4DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria de Sanctis:
Bishop Alfonso Maria de Sanctis (born , died ) Bishop of Todi

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013