Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerald Thomas Bergan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Omaha, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1892Born
28 Oct 191523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Peoria, Illinois, USA
24 Mar 193442.1AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
13 Jun 193442.3Ordained BishopBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
7 Feb 194856.0AppointedArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
11 Jun 196977.3RetiredArchbishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
11 Jun 196977.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tacarata
28 Jan 197179.0ResignedTitular Archbishop of Tacarata
12 Jul 197280.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Omaha, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Thomas Bergan
Archbishop Gerald Thomas Bergan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Omaha

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeoria

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jul 2017