Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Del Bene

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1880BornPalena
21 Dec 190222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
17 Dec 192848.5AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
14 Apr 192948.9Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
6 Apr 195776.8DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Del Bene:
Bishop Salvatore Del Bene (born , died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013