Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Francis Markham

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Acalissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1891BornLowell
2 Jun 191726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
18 Jul 195059.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
18 Jul 195059.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Acalissus
14 Sep 195059.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acalissus
9 Jul 195261.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Markham:
Bishop Thomas Francis Markham (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013