Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Albert Gregory Cardinal Meyer

Deceased

Archbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1903Born
11 Jul 192623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
18 Feb 194642.9AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
11 Apr 194643.0Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
21 Jul 195350.3AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
24 Sep 195350.5InstalledArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
19 Sep 195855.5AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
14 Nov 195855.6InstalledArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
14 Dec 195956.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 195956.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
9 Apr 196562.0DiedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Albert Gregory Meyer
Albert Gregory Cardinal Meyer (born , died ) Archbishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
  • a cardinal for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 25
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 532, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast