Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Simeoni

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1816Born
1839²22.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 187558.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
5 Mar 187558.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
15 Mar 187558.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
4 Apr 187558.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
17 Sep 187559.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 187660.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
18 Dec 187660.4AppointedSecretary of State
7 Feb 187861.5CeasedSecretary of State
5 Mar 187861.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
14 Jan 189275.5DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Simeoni (VIAF: 32772700)
Giovanni Cardinal Simeoni (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaliano, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina, Italy
Ordained BishopUrbanian College of Propaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Pontifical Urban Athenaeum Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
  • a cardinal for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 197, and Page 52
  • c4: CB, 27 May 2016
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1875
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017