Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francis John Cardinal Brennan

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1894BornShenandoah, PA
3 Apr 192025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
1 Aug 194046.2AppointedOfficial of the Roman Rota
14 Dec 195965.6AppointedDean of the Roman Rota
10 Jun 196773.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
25 Jun 196773.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
26 Jun 196773.1Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 196773.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
15 Jan 196873.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
2 Jul 196874.2DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Francis John Brennan:
Cardinal Francis John Brennan (born , died ) Prefect of Discipline of the Sacraments

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013