Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Delphis Des Rosiers, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Qacha’s Nek


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1906BornSt-Jacques d'Embrun, Canada
6 Jul 193024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Mar 194842.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Basutoland, Lesotho
11 Mar 194842.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pachnemunis
29 Jun 194842.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pachnemunis
11 Jan 195144.8AppointedBishop of Maseru, Lesotho
3 Jan 196154.8AppointedBishop of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho
17 Jul 198175.4ResignedBishop of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho
22 Jun 198983.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Joseph Delphis Des Rosiers:
Bishop Joseph Delphis Des Rosiers O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Qacha’s Nek

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015