Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Velletri-Segni

(Cardinal Titular Church)

Veliternus-Signinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francis Arinze, Cardinal, Cardinal-Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Cardinal Titular Church
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Cardinal-Bishop Title

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Cardinal Titular Church of Velletri
5 May 1914SplitCardinal Titular Church of Ostia (e Velletri) Cardinal Titular Church of Velletri
Cardinal Titular Church of Velletri e Segni
20 October 1981UnitedCardinal Titular Church of Velletri Cardinal Titular Church of Velletri e Segni
30 September 1986Name ChangedCardinal Titular Church of Velletri e Segni
Cardinal Titular Church of Velletri-Segni
30 September 1986Name ChangedCardinal Titular Church of Velletri-Segni

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Apr 2013