Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Melomo

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1879Born
24 Sep 190122.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 192243.0AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
21 May 192243.1Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
7 Feb 192747.9AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
28 Aug 194061.4AppointedArchbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy
28 Jun 194566.3DiedArchbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Melomo
Archbishop Antonio Melomo (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCassano all'Jonio

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast