Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Aloysius Boland

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1896BornOrange, NJ
23 Dec 192226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
21 May 194044.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
21 May 194044.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
25 Jul 194044.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
21 Jun 194751.3AppointedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
15 Nov 195256.7AppointedArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
14 Jan 195356.9InstalledArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
25 Mar 197478.1RetiredArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
16 Mar 197983.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Aloysius Boland:
Archbishop Thomas Aloysius Boland (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Newark

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1940, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013