Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Marie YŁen K’ai-chih (Yuan Kezhi, Yuen Ching-ping)

Deceased

Bishop of Zhumadian [Chumatien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1898Born
24 Dec 191921.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 193941.3AppointedPrefect of Chumatien [Zhumadian], China
9 Nov 194446.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
9 Nov 194446.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chumatien [Zhumadian], China
4 Mar 194547.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
11 Apr 194648.1AppointedBishop of Zhumadian [Chumatien], China
30 Jan 196970.9DiedBishop of Zhumadian [Chumatien], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Marie YŁen K’ai-chih (Yuan Kezhi, Yuen Ching-ping)
Bishop Joseph Marie YŁen K’ai-chih (Yuan Kezhi, Yuen Ching-ping) (born , died ) Bishop of Zhumadian [Chumatien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShen-Chwang-Tanhsien
Ordained BishopPeking
Death PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1945, Number 8
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast