Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Augustin Henschke

Deceased

Bishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1892Born
2 Jun 191725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Port Augusta, Australia
18 May 193745.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Adelaide, Australia
18 May 193745.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Praenetus
15 Aug 193745.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Praenetus
16 Nov 193947.8AppointedBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia
24 Feb 196876.1DiedBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia

MicroData Summary for Francis Augustin Henschke
Bishop Francis Augustin Henschke (born , died ) Bishop of Wagga Wagga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHookina

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,937, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast