Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard Franz (Franziskus) Demann

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1900Born
30 Oct 192727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
21 May 195655.5AppointedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Mar 195756.4DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Mar 195756.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Franz (Franziskus) Demann
Bishop Gerhard Franz (Franziskus) Demann (born , died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFreren

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for -.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast