Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sidney Matthew Metzger

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of El Paso, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1902Born
3 Apr 192623.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
27 Dec 193937.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
27 Dec 193937.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
10 Apr 194037.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
26 Dec 194139.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
29 Nov 194240.3SucceededBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
17 Mar 197875.6RetiredBishop of El Paso, Texas, USA
12 Apr 198683.7DiedBishop Emeritus of El Paso, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Sidney Matthew Metzger
Bishop Sidney Matthew Metzger (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of El Paso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFredericksburg, TX

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 21
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Aug 2018

Quantcast