Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Amedeo Casabona

Deceased

Bishop of Chiavari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1867Born
20 Sep 189023.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 191750.6AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
8 Dec 191750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiavari, Italy
21 Nov 194275.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Chiavari, Italy
6 Mar 194881.0DiedBishop of Chiavari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Amedeo Casabona
Archbishop Amedeo Casabona (born , died ) Bishop of Chiavari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamogli

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1917, Number 55
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 641, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast