Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Boyle

Deceased

Bishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1885Born
17 May 191327.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 194458.6AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
6 Jun 194458.8Ordained BishopBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
3 Jun 195468.8DiedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Boyle
Bishop James Boyle (born , died ) Bishop of Charlottetown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMerland

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018