Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Luigi Barlassina

Deceased

Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1872BornTorino
22 Dec 189422.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 191846.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
9 Aug 191846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
8 Sep 191846.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
8 Mar 192047.9AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
27 Sep 194775.4DiedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Luigi Barlassina:
Patriarch Luigi Barlassina (born , died ) Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013