Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Brennan

Deceased

Bishop of Toowoomba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1904BornLewisham
17 Dec 192723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
7 Aug 195348.8AppointedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
21 Oct 195349.0Ordained BishopBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
8 Nov 195349.0InstalledBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
11 Sep 197570.9DiedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Brennan:
Bishop William Joseph Brennan (born , died ) Bishop of Toowoomba

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013