Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romuald Denis Hayes, S.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rockhampton


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1892BornMelbourne
10 Aug 191725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
12 Jan 193240.0AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
3 Apr 193240.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
24 Apr 193240.2InstalledBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
25 Oct 194553.7DiedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Romuald Denis Hayes:
Bishop Romuald Denis Hayes S.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Rockhampton

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013