Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Marella

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Fabric of St. Peter

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1895BornRoma
23 Feb 191823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
15 Sep 193338.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Doclea
29 Oct 193338.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Doclea
30 Oct 193338.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Japan
27 Oct 194853.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Australia
27 Oct 194853.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to New Zealand
15 Apr 195358.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
14 Dec 195964.8Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 195964.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
31 Mar 196065.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea delle Fratte
14 Aug 196166.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Basilica of St. Peter
14 Aug 196166.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
19 May 196469.3AppointedPresident of the Secretariat of Non-Christians
15 Aug 196772.5AppointedPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
15 Mar 197277.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
26 Feb 197378.0RetiredPresident of the Secretariat of Non-Christians
8 Feb 198388.0RetiredPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
8 Feb 198388.0RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
15 Oct 198489.7DiedPresident Emeritus of the Fabric of St. Peter

MicroData Summary for Paolo Marella:
Paolo Cardinal Marella (born , died ) President Emeritus of Fabric of St. Peter

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 50.9 years
  • a cardinal for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1933, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014