Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Adeodato Giovanni Cardinal Piazza, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Secretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1884Born
6 Aug 190217.8EnteredMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
7 Aug 190318.8ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
7 Aug 190722.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
19 Dec 190824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
29 Jan 193045.3AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
24 Feb 193045.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
23 Mar 193045.4InstalledArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
16 Dec 193551.2AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
13 Dec 193753.2Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193753.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
1948²63.2AppointedSecretary General of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
1 Oct 194864.0AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
14 Mar 194964.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
1951²66.2CeasedSecretary General of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
30 Nov 195773.1DiedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adeodato Giovanni Piazza (VIAF: 61643335)
Adeodato Giovanni Cardinal Piazza O.C.D. (born , died ) Secretary of Sacred Consistorial Congregation

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVigo de Cadore, Diocese of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
Ordained PriestVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Teresa al Corso d`Italia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Teresa al Corso d`Italia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
  • a cardinal for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 9
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 276, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 344, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 359, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 414, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 483, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 676, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 4 Dec 2019

Quantcast