Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Allen James Babcock

Deceased

Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1898BornBad Axe, MI
7 Mar 192526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
15 Feb 194748.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
15 Feb 194748.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
25 Mar 194748.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
23 Mar 195455.8AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
27 Jun 196971.0DiedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Allen James Babcock:
Bishop Allen James Babcock (born , died ) Bishop of Grand Rapids

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013