Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe de Nardis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

Titular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1866Born
16 Jun 188922.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 191649.8AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
30 Nov 191650.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
1 Apr 195386.4RetiredBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
1 Apr 195386.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Palaestina
18 Dec 195690.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de Nardis
Bishop Giuseppe de Nardis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapri

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 40
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1916, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast