Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Benjamin Grellinger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin

Titular Bishop of Syene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1899BornMilwaukee
14 Jul 192929.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 194949.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
16 May 194949.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Syene
14 Jul 194949.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Syene
21 Sep 197474.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
13 Apr 198484.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for John Benjamin Grellinger:
Bishop John Benjamin Grellinger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015