Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Edward Ryan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Townsville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1888BornKyabram
17 Jun 191628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sandhurst, Australia
13 Jul 193850.2AppointedBishop of Townsville, Australia
18 Oct 193850.5Ordained BishopBishop of Townsville, Australia
14 Sep 196779.4RetiredBishop of Townsville, Australia
14 Sep 196779.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nigizubi
13 Oct 197688.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Nigizubi
13 Nov 197789.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Townsville, Australia

MicroData Summary for Hugh Edward Ryan:
Bishop Hugh Edward Ryan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Townsville

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013