Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Abel Caillouet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Setea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1900Born
7 Mar 192524.5Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
2 Aug 194747.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
2 Aug 194747.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Setea
28 Oct 194747.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Setea
7 Jul 197675.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
16 Sep 198484.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Abel Caillouet
Bishop Louis Abel Caillouet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThibodaux

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast