Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Zaffarami

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Todi

Titular Bishop of Ulpiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1864BornQuadro
1888¹23.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 191550.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Todi, Italy
22 Jan 191550.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasima
31 Jan 191550.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasima
6 Dec 191551.1AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
10 Feb 193368.3ResignedBishop of Todi, Italy
10 Feb 193368.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
19 Sep 193974.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Zaffarami:
Bishop Luigi Zaffarami (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Todi

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 3
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 332, and Page 379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013