Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William Theodore Cardinal Heard

Deceased

Dean Emeritus of the Roman Rota

Cardinal-Priest of San Teodoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1884BornEdinburgh
30 Mar 191834.1Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
15 Dec 195874.8AppointedDean of the Roman Rota
14 Dec 195975.8Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 195975.8ResignedDean of the Roman Rota
14 Dec 195975.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
5 Apr 196278.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
19 Apr 196278.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
19 Apr 196278.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
18 May 197086.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Teodoro
16 Sep 197389.6DiedDean Emeritus of the Roman Rota

MicroData Summary for William Theodore Heard:
Cardinal William Theodore Heard (born , died ) Dean Emeritus of Roman Rota

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013