Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Henri-Joseph Cardinal Luçon

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1842Born
23 Dec 185614.1Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
16 Nov 188745.0SelectedBishop of Belley, France
25 Nov 188745.0ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
8 Feb 188845.2Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
24 Feb 188845.3InstalledBishop of Belley, France
21 Feb 190663.3AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
16 Dec 190765.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 190765.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
28 May 193087.5DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Henri-Joseph Luçon (VIAF: 71525157)
Louis-Henri-Joseph Cardinal Luçon (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaulévrier, Diocese of Angers
Ordained PriestAngers, Diocese of Angers
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cholet
Death Place9, rue du Cardinal-de-Lorraine, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims
Buried Place (Original)Crypt of the Archbishop, Cathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a priest for 73.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
  • a cardinal for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 7
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jun 2017