Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Albani

Deceased

Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1720BornRome, Italy
10 Apr 174727.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 174727.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
31 Mar 174828.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
12 Feb 175938.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
21 Jul 176040.4AppointedBishop of Sabina, Italy
21 Jul 176040.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
21 Sep 176040.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sabina, Italy
15 Mar 177353.0AppointedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
15 Mar 177353.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
18 Dec 177555.8AppointedBishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
18 Dec 177555.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
179372.8AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
15 Sep 180383.5DiedBishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Albani:
Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Albani (born , died ) Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a bishop for 42.9 years
  • a cardinal for 56.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015