Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jorge María Cardinal Mejía

Deceased

Archivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archive

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo della Carità a Via Giulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1923Born
22 Sep 194522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
8 Mar 198663.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
8 Mar 198663.1AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Commission for Justice and Peace
12 Apr 198663.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
28 Jun 198865.4AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
5 Mar 199471.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apollonia
5 Mar 199471.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
10 Mar 199471.1AppointedSecretary of the College of Cardinals
7 Mar 199875.1AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive
7 Mar 199875.1AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
21 Feb 200178.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Carità a Via Giulia
21 Feb 200178.0Elevated to Cardinal
24 Feb 200178.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Carità a Via Giulia
Oct 200380.6RetiredArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive
Oct 200380.6RetiredLibrarian of the Vatican Library
21 Feb 201188.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo della Carità a Via Giulia
9 Dec 201491.8DiedArchivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archive

MicroData Summary for Jorge María Mejía (VIAF: 84717145)
Jorge María Cardinal Mejía (born , died ) Archivist Emeritus of Vatican Secret Archive

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2011
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2001
  • d: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 1 Nov 2019

Quantcast