Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño

Dioecesis Calaguritanus et Calceatensis - Lucroniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 9 March 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 5,033 (1,943 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiaenlarioja.org/
  • Mailing Address: Obispo Fidel Garcia 1, 26004 Logrono [La Rioja], Espana
  • Telephone: 941.27.00.08
  • Fax: 941.27.10.98

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Calahorra
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Calahorra (erected)
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
13th CenturyUnitedDiocese of Calahorra
Diocese of La Calzada
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
8 September 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Burgos
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Diocese of Santander
Diocese of Vitoria (erected)
2 November 1949Territory LostDiocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Diocese of Santander
Diocese of Vitoria
Diocese of Bilbao (erected)
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño
9 March 1959Name ChangedDiocese of Calahorra y La Calzada Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
1949235,000235,000100.0%442124566415260850353ap1951
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño
1959234,800234,99099.9%4001385384368511,070273ap1960
1970235,020235,14099.9%336107443530197885275ap1971
1980250,392252,11099.3%304138442566277936263ap1981
1990261,725265,41498.6%297117414632264855247ap1991
1999262,743267,02298.4%249110359731222794248ap2000
2000263,554271,13497.2%248106354744218782248ap2001
2001261,744270,87596.6%243107350747218769248ap2002
2002265,027273,51496.9%2391073467651216763248ap2003
2003266,119296,09789.9%2331053387871226759248ap2004
2004261,715287,00091.2%2251043297951209750248ap2005
2006273,101301,08490.7%236104340803178762230ap2007
2013291,100323,60990.0%212682801,039175600253ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014