Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Dugnani

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1748BornMilano
21 Sep 177123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 Apr 178536.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
12 Jun 178537.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
18 Jun 178537.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1790²41.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
21 Feb 179445.7Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 179446.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
23 Dec 180153.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
31 Oct 180456.3AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
16 May 180556.9ResignedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
3 Aug 180759.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
8 Mar 181667.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
16 Mar 181768.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
19 Oct 181870.3DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Dugnani (VIAF: 89095433)
Antonio Cardinal Dugnani (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
  • a cardinal for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1794
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 24
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016