Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmus Perchinger, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Titular Bishop of Salona


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1482AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
6 Nov 1482AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
18 Nov 1482Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salona
26 Sep 1483DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Erasmus Perchinger
Bishop Erasmus Perchinger O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 228
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Dec 2018

Quantcast