Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomäus Scholl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Titular Bishop of Dariensis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1550Born
10 May 158130.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
10 May 158130.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dariensis
20 Jan 162978.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bartholomäus Scholl (VIAF: 102461089)
Bishop Bartholomäus Scholl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHohenwart

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 185
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast