Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Jakob von Heckenstaller

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Freising, Germany

Priest of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1748Born
19 Sep 177224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
14 Apr 180354.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Freising, Germany
16 Feb 181869.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Freising, Germany
7 Nov 183284.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Jakob von Heckenstaller
Father Joseph Jakob von Heckenstaller (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegensburg

  • a priest for 60.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast