Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Klingenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Freising


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1322AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
5 Jul 1324AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
8 Apr 1340DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Klingenberg:
Bishop Konrad von Klingenberg (died ) Bishop of Freising

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 255, and Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 21 Jan 2016