Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Ignaz von Streber

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Titular Bishop of Birtha

Titular See: (Society of St. Bartholomy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1758BornReisbach
177415.9ProfessedMember of Other
20 May 178022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Other
23 Dec 178022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Other
180344.9IncardinatedPriest of Freising, Germany
24 Sep 182163.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
24 Sep 182163.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
16 Dec 182163.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
26 Apr 184183.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Ignaz von Streber:
Bishop Franz Ignaz von Streber (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013