Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sixtus von Tannberg

Deceased

Bishop of Freising, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Apr 1470AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
12 Jan 1474AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
10 Apr 1474Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
14 Jul 1495DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sixtus von Tannberg (VIAF: 10914890)
Bishop Sixtus von Tannberg (died ) Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChoir, Cathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 162, and Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1474, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast