Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ernst von Bayern

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Bishop of Hildesheim

Bishop of Liège

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1554Born
18 Oct 156611.8SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
20 Dec 156612.0ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
7 Mar 157318.2SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
4 Oct 157318.7ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
19 Jun 157722.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 158126.1SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
3 Apr 158126.2ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
2 Jun 158328.4SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
7 Oct 158328.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 May 158530.4SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
27 Nov 158530.9ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
17 Feb 161257.1DiedArchbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ernst von Bayern (VIAF: 88905787)
Father Ernst von Bayern (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen

  • a priest for 34.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247, and Page 198
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210, and Page 222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast