Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Reinhard Cardinal Marx

Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Cardinal-Priest of San Corbiniano

Member of the Council of Cardinals

Coordinator of the Secretariat for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1953 BornGeseke
2 Jun 197925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
23 Jul 199642.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
23 Jul 199642.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Petina
21 Sep 199643.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petina
20 Dec 200148.2AppointedBishop of Trier, Germany
1 Apr 200248.5InstalledBishop of Trier, Germany
30 Nov 200754.2AppointedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
2 Feb 200854.4InstalledArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
20 Nov 201057.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201057.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Corbiniano
5 Jun 201157.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Corbiniano
13 Apr 201359.6AppointedMember of the Council of Cardinals
8 Mar 201460.5AppointedCoordinator of the Secretariat for the Economy

MicroData Summary for Reinhard Marx:
Reinhard Cardinal Marx (born ) Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2007
  • i: Bollettino, 30 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,848
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Apr 2014