Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregor (Leonhard Andreas) von Scherr, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1804Born
25 Jul 182925.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
4 Aug 182925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
29 Dec 183329.5ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jan 185651.5SelectedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
19 Jun 185651.9ConfirmedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
3 Aug 185652.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
28 Aug 185652.1InstalledArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
24 Oct 187773.3DiedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gregor (Leonhard Andreas) von Scherr (VIAF: 819025)
Archbishop Gregor (Leonhard Andreas) von Scherr O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeunburg vorm Wald, Diocese of Regensburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, München, Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Feb 2017