Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Schach, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

Titular Bishop of Saldae


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1495AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
19 Nov 1495AppointedTitular Bishop of Saldae
4 Jun 1497Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saldae
5 Nov 1515DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Mathias Schach:
Bishop Mathias Schach O. Cart. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,433
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013