Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Rhein (Palatins, von der Pfalz)

Deceased

Bishop of Freising, Germany

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1487Born
16 Mar 152437.0AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
6 May 152437.2SelectedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
15 Jul 152437.4ConfirmedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
20 Aug 152942.5ResignedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
27 Aug 154053.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Freising, Germany
5 Jan 154153.8SucceededBishop of Freising, Germany
3 Jan 155264.8DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Rhein (Palatins, von der Pfalz) (VIAF: 67402032)
Bishop Heinrich von Rhein (Palatins, von der Pfalz) (born , died ) Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeidelberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316, and Page 198
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1524, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast