Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Dionys Albert Paul Defregger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

Titular Bishop of Vicus Aterii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1915BornMünchen
29 Jun 194934.3Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
3 Jul 196853.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
3 Jul 196853.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Aterii
14 Sep 196853.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Aterii
6 Apr 199075.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
23 Jul 199580.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Mathias Dionys Albert Paul Defregger:
Bishop Mathias Dionys Albert Paul Defregger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015