Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus von Hötzl, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1836BornRottach
27 Oct 185721.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
30 Mar 186023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Nov 189458.3SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
18 Mar 189558.6ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1 May 189558.7Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
9 Mar 190265.6DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Petrus von Hötzl:
Bishop Petrus von Hötzl O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013